UNIVERSITIES FEDERATION FOR ANIMAL WELFARE

Charity number: 207996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

UFAW IS AN INTERNATIONALLY RECOGNISED, INDEPENDENT, SCIENTIFIC AND EDUCATIONAL ANIMAL WELFARE CHARITY. THE ORGANISATION IS CONCERNED WITH PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS OF WELFARE FOR FARM, COMPANION, LABORATORY AND CAPTIVE WILD ANIMALS, AND FOR THOSE ANIMALS WITH WHICH WE INTERACT IN THE WILD.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Argentina
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Bangladesh
  • Belgium
  • Brazil
  • Canada
  • Chile
  • India
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Kenya
  • New Zealand
  • Norway
  • Portugal
  • Sri Lanka
  • Sweden
  • Uganda
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1992: Standard registration
  • 18 November 2004: Removed (Registered in error)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • U F A W (Working name)
  • THE UNIVERSITIES FEDERATION FOR ANIMAL WELFARE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Emily Craven Trustee 16 November 2022
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Emma-Louise Singh Trustee 16 November 2022
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Paula Junqueira Trustee 16 November 2022
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Dr Dorothy Elizabeth Fairlie McKeegan Trustee 16 November 2022
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Jane Downes Trustee 07 November 2022
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Alison Enticknap Trustee 16 October 2019
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Dr Siobhan Abeysinghe Trustee 17 October 2018
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Dr Ingrid Anna Olsson Trustee 19 October 2016
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
DR DAVID RICHARD SARGAN MA Trustee 20 December 2012
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CORRIE LYNDIS MCCANN Trustee 27 October 2011
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
PROFESSOR RICHARD MARK BENNETT Trustee
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
DAVID GEORGE PRITCHARD Trustee
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN RADFORD OBE LLB Trustee
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £506.47k £426.99k £383.33k £422.52k £525.02k
Total expenditure £734.33k £566.31k £642.93k £638.09k £658.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £146.31k N/A N/A N/A £238.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £142.97k N/A N/A N/A £96.39k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £217.19k N/A N/A N/A £190.61k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £67.49k N/A N/A N/A £209.44k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £630.84k N/A N/A N/A £591.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds £103.49k N/A N/A N/A £67.44k
Expenditure - Governance £199.39k N/A N/A N/A £4.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £68.79k N/A N/A N/A £15.43k
Expenditure - Investment management £42.59k N/A N/A N/A £39.88k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £414.76k N/A N/A N/A £386.76k
Long-term investments £6.74m N/A N/A N/A £7.61m
Other assets £312.74k N/A N/A N/A £497.57k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £126.74k N/A N/A N/A £145.78k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH MARCH 1991, AND AMENDED 16TH OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS ON AN INTERNATIONAL BASIS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 28 February 1992 : Standard registration
  • 18 November 2004 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Universities Federation for Animal
WELFARE
The Old School
Brewhouse Hill
Wheathampstead
ST. ALBA
Phone:
01582831818