THE BEXHILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Payment/donation of grants for the relief of poverty, the advancement of education, any other charitable objects of general public utility. The recipients must reside within the area of the former Borough of Bexhill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Viv Taylor-Gee | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elly Gibson | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Drayson | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Sarah Errington | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.26k | £2.45k | £2.44k | £139 | £164 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.84k | £2.86k | £3.96k | £2.42k | £2.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 1917
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND (C) FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF GENERAL PUBLIC UTILITY, PROVIDED THAT IN NO CASE SHALL IT BE APPLIED DIRECTLEY OR INDIRECTLEY IN AID OF RATES.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF BEXHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Woodville Road
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN39 3ET
- Phone:
- 07514624185
- Email:
- bexhilltrust@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
bexhilltrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window