Financial history FESTINA LENTE LODGE NO 5970 BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 208081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.45k £2.10k £2.55k £3.30k £215
Total expenditure £3.58k £1.69k £778 £3.82k £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A