Financial history SURREY DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 208084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £63.48k £45.79k £29.38k £10.90k £17.98k
Total expenditure £79.28k £44.48k £18.41k £25.59k £24.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A