Financial history COOMBE BISSETT UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 208104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £169 £162 £315 £168 £169
Total expenditure £265 £130 £415 £130 £126
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A