Financial history CHARITY OF MARY SAMBROOK

Charity number: 208132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £93 £94 £97 £100 £98
Total expenditure £92 £90 £50 £0 £98
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A