GEORGE SAVAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides housing for elderly people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT JOHN ELLIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Graham Lionel Trevor Simmons | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Edward Tucker | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geoffrey Walton | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIET BAIRD | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA MARY CRAIG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.99k | £12.73k | £12.26k | £13.03k | £14.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.72k | £4.03k | £3.83k | £15.41k | £4.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 December 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 29TH NOVEMBER 1957 AND 9TH FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
1. ALMSHOUSES OR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CAVENDISH AND NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE. 2. GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
CAVENDISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 GREYS CLOSE
CAVENDISH
SUDBURY
CO10 8BT
- Phone:
- 01787280366
- Email:
- hf_anglia@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window