SIR HENRY ATKINS

Charity Number: 208190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The three groups of charities provide in the area of benefit (the Ancient Parish of Berkhamsted St Peter) : (i) benefit to poor persons (ii) general benefit to the inhabitants (iii) benefit for "the sick poor".

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,434
Total expenditure: £5,560

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BERKHAMSTED PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Garrick Stevens Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Susan Waite Jordan Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Adam Hawkswood Trustee 15 May 2023
NORTHCHURCH UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Richard William James Currie Trustee 08 November 2022
JOHN SAYER ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Rev Stuart James Owen Trustee 12 September 2020
JOHN SAYER ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
SALTER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, GREAT BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
THE GIRLS' SPECIAL INSTRUCTION FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
BOURNE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days
ANGLICAN METHODIST ASSOCIATION (BERKHAMSTED) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S GREAT BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
BOURNES ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days
Edward Meade Hatley Trustee 09 June 2020
JOHN SAYER ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
NICOLA DONNA BEADLE Trustee
JOHN SAYER ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
MICHAEL HUGH MACLAREN ANDERSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.04k £6.14k £6.24k £6.40k £6.43k
Total expenditure £7.93k £15.36k £8.50k £5.23k £5.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 31 MARCH 1965 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 28 AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BERKHAMSTED ST PETER.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF BERKHAMSTED ST PETER
Registration history
  • 12 July 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
11 Kingsdale Road
BERKHAMSTED
Hertfordshire
HP4 3BS
Phone:
07900 409399
Website:

No information available