MILDENHALL PARISH CHARITIES

Charity Number: 208196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General benefit of the poor

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £15,048
Total expenditure: £14,507

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • The Charities of the Ancient Parish of Mildenhall (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Reginald Tanswell Trustee 08 September 2024
None on record
Jennifer Lesley Reeve Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Frances Grace Bristow Trustee 18 March 2019
None on record
Richard Alan Alecock Trustee 13 September 2017
FRIENDS OF THE MARKET CROSS SURGERY MILDENHALL
Received: On time
MILDENHALL TOWN CHARITY
Received: On time
ADRIAN FREDERICK JOHN PEACHEY Trustee
None on record
TERESA ANNE GOOCH-TAYLOR-BALLS Trustee
None on record
KAY SALLIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.03k £15.06k £15.03k £15.03k £15.05k
Total expenditure £4.46k £4.21k £32.77k £15.84k £14.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 16 JANUARY 1961
Charitable objects
1)PAYMENT TOWARDS THE COST OF REPAIRS TO THE PARISH CHURCH 2)GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF MILDENHALL
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
22 LARK ROAD
MILDENHALL
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP28 7LA
Phone:
01638718079
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available