Trustees FETHERSTONHAUGH RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity Number: 208200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL BRAMFITT Trustee 19 November 2024
HARTING WAR MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
WARREN AND WEAVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Simon Holland Trustee 12 November 2024
WARREN AND WEAVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Beverley Albery Trustee 13 September 2022
WARREN AND WEAVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Emma Jane Overend Trustee 13 September 2022
WARREN AND WEAVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Linda Huggett Trustee 13 September 2022
WARREN AND WEAVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
HARTING CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH
Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
Hatti Cossart Trustee 12 March 2019
None on record
Steve Walker Trustee 12 March 2019
WARREN AND WEAVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Pauline Mary Barnfield Trustee 08 April 2013
None on record
MRS JANE HEALEY Trustee
WARREN AND WEAVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH ANN LAWRENCE Trustee
WARREN AND WEAVER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time