THE MOUNT EVEREST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation's primary object is to provide grants and recognition to assist particularly deserving expeditions for the exploration of, and scientific work in, the mountain regions of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Stephens | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tom Kenneth Roger Matthews | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adele Long | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Neal Bass | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John da Silva | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jemma Wadham | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Grace Hurford | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Poshendra Satyal | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard COATSWORTH | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.40k | £62.70k | £62.01k | £67.20k | £99.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.50k | £89.80k | £114.33k | £98.90k | £167.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH JANUARY 1955 AND AMENDED 11TH JUNE 1974 as amended on 23 Nov 2023 as amended on 23 Nov 2023 as amended on 23 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE OR SUPPORT EXPEDITIONS FOR THE EXPLORATION OF THE MOUNTAIN REGIONS OF THE EARTH. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 Ingersley Vale
Bollington
MACCLESFIELD
Cheshire
SK10 5BP
- Phone:
- 01625574809
- Email:
- coatsworthra@gmail.com
- Website:
-
mef.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window