Governing document LITTLE SISTERS OF THE ASSUMPTION CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity Number: 208208

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 DECEMBER 1963, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 5 JUNE 1991, ORDER DATED 1 APRIL 2003, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 7 APRIL 2003 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 1 JULY 2003. as amended on 02 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK CARRIED ON BY THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.