Financial history GREAT YELDHAM UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 208214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.71k £5.09k £5.19k £5.30k £5.30k
Total expenditure £2.70k £0 £0 £15.07k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A