CORYTON ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity owns 4 one-bedroom cottages which are let at a discounted rent to retired, local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 July 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Crick | Chair | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Broome | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marriott | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clayre Shona Williams | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.83k | £17.59k | £14.72k | £17.70k | £19.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.23k | £7.44k | £16.27k | £21.10k | £64.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02 AUG 1939 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14 APR 1966 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 JAN 1976 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF EITHER GENDER USUALLY OR MAINLY RESIDENT IN ANY OF THE PARISHES OF LISS, GREATHAM OR HAWKLEY WITH NO REGARD TO THEIR RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL OPINIONS AND PREFERABLY THOSE WHO HAVE WORKED IN SOME AGRICULTURAL OR RELATED OCCUPATION AND/OR HUSBANDS OR WIVES OR WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS OF SUCH PERSONS; AND SO FAR AS REASONABLY POSSIBLE SUCH PERSONS SHALL NOT BE UNDER THE AGE OF SIXTY. 2. TO PROVIDE AN EXTRAORDINARY REPAIR FUND. 3. RESIDUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF LISS, GREATHAM AND HAWKLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coryton Almshouses
Farnham Road
LISS
Hampshire
GU33 6JU
- Phone:
- 01730000000
- Email:
- info@corytonalmshouses.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window