Financial history ELIZABETH COOKE ( ALIAS CHAPMAN ) AND GERTRUDE PECK

Charity number: 208249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37 £166 £131 £577 £104
Total expenditure £40 £200 £30 £242 £52
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A