RADLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives remain the furtherance of: Conflict Resolution Peace Justice and Human Rights Sustainable developments Equality of opportunity and improving quality of life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARISA JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lia Judith Johanna den Daas | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Verder Hambrook Doubleday | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Doughty | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fionna Margaret Ruth Tod | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELGA LEONORA TOMKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE WHEATLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Becky Reddy | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.10k | £24.06k | £51.76k | £43.61k | £20.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.02k | £28.87k | £44.48k | £39.30k | £42.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT 30TH NOVEMBER 1951 as amended on 27 Nov 2023 as amended on 27 Nov 2023 as amended on 27 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
GRANTS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Gate
Church Road
Chrishall
ROYSTON
Hertfordshire
SG8 8QT
- Phone:
- 00000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window