CHARITY OF ELIZABETH MORLEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 July 1962: Standard registration
- 28 July 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 28 July 2006: Funds transferred to 202634 LAND AND POSSESSIONS OF THE POOR OF ELY OTHERWISE ...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2004 | 11 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 21ST NOVEMBER 1972 AS MODIFIED BY RESOLUTION SIGNED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 9 AUGUST 2005 PASSED UNDER SECTION 74(2)(A) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF ELY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 2. SUBJECT AS AFORESAID THE SAID INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF ELY AS THE GOVERNORS THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF ELY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window