HANWORTH POORS LAND TRUST AND COAL FUND

Charity Number: 208330
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Financial relief for residents of Hanworth recommended by Health Workers and other community workers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016

Total income: £6
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Hounslow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 28 July 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £6 £5 £0 £6 £6
Total expenditure £854 £904 £4 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 31 March 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 19 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
INCLOSURE AWARD 1803 PR VOL 9 PAGE 303
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE FORMER PARISH OF HANWORTH.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF HANWORTH
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 28 July 2017 : Removed