THE CHURCH OF SCOTLAND LONDON ADVISORY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Borderline supports homeless and insecurely housed Scots in London. We help people find accommodation in London and specialise in resettling clients in Scotland. Borderline helps clients obtain birth certificates, helps find hostel rooms, and can access referrals to alcohol, drug and mental health services. We aim to help every client find secure, long-term accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 September 1964: Standard registration
- 17 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BORDERLINE (Working name)
- COSLAS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.18k | £169.22k | £160.37k | £237.61k | £225.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £277.90k | £240.18k | £254.17k | £262.22k | £266.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 22 April 2010 | 81 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 12 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 12 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 01 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 12 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 17 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND OCTOBER 1950 AND SCHEME OF 24TH MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 8TH JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED AMONG YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE RESIDENT, WORKING, OR PURSUING EDUCATION OF TRAINING AT EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN GREATER LONDON WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE BORN OR EDUCATED IN SCOTLAND OR ARE OTHERWISE OF SCOTTISH ORIGIN IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED: (B) IN HELPING AND EDUCATING SUCH YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, MORAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, SO THAT THEY MEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window