HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of the HAC Regiment (a Reserve Unit of the Army), a Detachment of the City of London Special Constabulary, Benevolent Fund and ceremonial Sub-units (The Pikemen & Musketeers and the Light Cavalry), Conservation of the Company's Estate and Preservation of the Company's Treasures; by assisting with recruitment, Sustaining Company Membership and ensuring Long-Term Sustainability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£5,096,000
Donations and legacies | £123.00k | |
Charitable activities | £323.00k | |
Other trading activities | £4.09m | |
Investments | £231.00k | |
Other | £331.00k |
Total expenditure:
£5,739,000
Raising funds | £1.66m | |
Charitable activities | £4.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£204,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.66m | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.08m |
People

25 Employee(s)
29 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 April 1964: Standard registration
- H A C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hamish Mundell | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sylvia Frances Edwards | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Dadzie-Yorke | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Martin Douglas King | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Major Francis Oliver Smiddy | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lt General Sir Charles Roland Vincent Walker KCB DSO | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Gordon Brooke | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Robert Stuart Thomas Murphy | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col George Cobb | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Cutteridge | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Karl Eze | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Howard James Philip Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Gabb | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Frederick Sivyer | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maj Christian Oliver Wragg | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Simon John Rhodes Halliday TD | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Maj Iain Cardean Spottiswoode Morpeth TD | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Major Peter Dirom Courtenay Vyvyan-Robinson | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Major David Brigden | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Major James Alexander Robinson | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Major Hari Voyantzis | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Hulbert Grove | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Lloyd Davies | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN HUGO ROLAND JEE | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR GENERAL SIMON FRANCIS NEIL LALOR CB, TD | Trustee | 02 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
EDWIN ALBERT SEABROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJOR SIMON CHRISTOPHER BRIGGS TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Charles Verriour Marment | Trustee |
|
||||||
LT. COL JOHN ROBERT LONGBOTTOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.39m | £3.55m | £3.38m | £4.64m | £5.10m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91m | £3.79m | £3.01m | £4.09m | £5.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £23.00k | £56.00k | £37.00k | £12.00k | £123.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.21m | £1.16m | £917.00k | £2.07m | £4.09m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £319.00k | £514.00k | £309.00k | £320.00k | £323.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £6.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.81m | £1.83m | £1.93m | £1.97m | £231.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.02m | £0 | £191.00k | £264.00k | £331.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £23.00k | £50.00k | £20.00k | £0 | £116.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.07m | £2.26m | £1.81m | £2.56m | £4.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.84m | £1.52m | £1.20m | £1.53m | £1.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £54.00k | £780.00k | £734.00k | £822.00k | £929.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.13m | £668.00k | £418.00k | £765.00k | £1.72m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £282.00k | £68.00k | £73.00k | £48.00k | £60.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £41.92m | £5.38m | £5.11m | £46.32m | £4.72m | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.49m | £53.36m | £55.62m | £9.90m | £48.10m | |
|
Other assets | £5.45m | £3.96m | £4.14m | £5.07m | £4.52m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£86.00k | -£72.00k | -£63.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.50m | £657.00k | £687.00k | £1.06m | £1.13m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED BY KING HENRY VIII ON 25 AUGUST 1537
Charitable objects
FOR MILITARY EXERCISE AND TRAINING AND FOR THE BETTER DEFENCE OF THE REALM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- CHARLES OSCAR GRIDLEY TRUST FOR THE HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY
- HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY BENEVOLENT FUND
- HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY BENEVOLENT FUND (1961)
- HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY COMPASSIONATE FUND
- HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY OLD COMRADES ASSOCIATION
- HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY WAR MEMORIAL (1939-45) FUND
- THE LANDALE BEQUEST
- 22 April 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Honourable Artillery Co
Finsbury Barracks
City Road
LONDON
EC1Y 2BQ
- Phone:
- 0207 382 1537
- Email:
- hac@hac.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window