RELATE CAMBRIDGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 July 1962: Standard registration
- 29 July 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 July 2004: Funds transferred to 1096975 RELATE CAMBRIDGESHIRE
- CAMBRIDGE RELATE (Working name)
- CAMBRIDGE MARRIAGE GUIDANCE COUNCIL (Previous name)
- RELATE, CAMBRIDGE MARRIAGE GUIDANCE (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16 OCTOBER 1969 AS AMENDED 3 JULY 1984 AND 12TH SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE INSTITUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SEXUAL RELATIONSHIPS AND WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING PERSONAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND ENRICHING FAMILY LIFE. (B) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF MARRIED LIFE AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH. (C) TO SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN AND TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK-UP OF THE MARRIAGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window