Financial history SOUTHWARK (CHRISTCHURCH AND ST MARY`S) CHARITIES

Charity number: 208500
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £266.85k £270.55k £287.85k £290.72k £276.04k
Total expenditure £447.19k £262.49k £220.45k £233.27k £235.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A