Accounts and annual returns ST MARY NEWINGTON, UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 208502
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 12 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 12 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 11 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 11 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 18 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 18 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 24 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 24 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 15 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 15 September 2006 On Time