Financial history ST MARY NEWINGTON, UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 208502
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £175.97k £180.84k £191.80k £207.52k £189.62k
Total expenditure £219.54k £229.92k £219.32k £259.26k £187.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A