Linked charities ST MARY NEWINGTON, UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 208502
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 5 JULY 1904 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 2 MAY 1966, 25 SEPTEMBER 1967 AND 27 APRIL 1971
Charitable objects
1) FIXED PAYMENT OF ú600 PER ANNUM TO ST. MARY, NEWINGTON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION. 2) ú300 PER ANNUM TO BOROUGH ROAD POLYTECHNIC AS LONG AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER OF APPOINTING A GOVERNOR OF THE COLLEGE. 2) BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE OF THE ALMSHOUSES BELONGING TO THE CHARITIES, WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OR MARRIED COUPLES OF GOOD CHARACTER OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT. 3) PAYMENT OF PENSIONS TO PENSIONERS WITH SAME QUALIFICATIONS AS ABOVE. 4) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
FORMER PARISH OF ST. MARY, NEWINGTON.
Registration history
- 04 July 1962 : Standard registration
- 16 December 2010 : Removed
- 16 December 2010 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.