Financial history THOMAS HEWAR

Charity number: 208553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.58k £1.39k £1.61k £3.87k £1.59k
Total expenditure £2.43k £543 £755 £526 £566
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A