THE NORFOLK BRANCH OF THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY
Charity Number: 208568
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 16 July 1965: Standard registration
- 12 June 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTERS OF 1908, 1919 AND 1955 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
1. TO FURNISH AID TO THE SICK AND WOUNDED IN TIME OF WAR. 2. THE IMPROVEMENT OF HEALTH THE PREVENTION OF DISEASE AND THE MITIGATION OF SUFFERING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORFOLK
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 4TH MARCH, 1935 SCHEME OF 25 FEBRUARY 1936
Charitable objects
PREMISES TO BE USED AS A DRESSING STATION FOR FISHER FOLK IF SOLD INCOME TO BE USED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NORFOLK BRANCH OF THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Registration history
- 16 July 1965 : Standard registration
- 12 June 1997 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.