Financial history THE CHILDREN'S FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 208607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.02m £7.70m £8.64m £8.96m £9.72m
Total expenditure £7.29m £7.58m £8.52m £9.06m £9.60m
Income from government contracts £6.97m £7.64m £8.64m £8.96m £9.72m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.05k £15.55k £34.53k £67.74k £22.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.82k £44.58k £20.24k £43.24k £99.79k
Income - Other £2.80k £5.40k £7.40k £2.40k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.25m £7.54m £8.46m £9.00m £9.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.85k £32.83k £64.89k £58.56k £63.66k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £37.38k £32.56k £64.89k £58.56k £63.66k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0