HIGH BARNET BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objectives of the charity are the worship of God and the exposition, preaching, promulgation, dissemination and instruction of the Christian faith. The aim of the charity is to encourage Christians in their faith, to provide opportunities for non Christians to understand the Christian faith and to demonstrate God's love by helping those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Robert Prime | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Webster | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LEAK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.55k | £98.34k | £55.93k | £69.79k | £95.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.10k | £104.26k | £78.24k | £104.87k | £109.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 15 OCT 1892 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 MAY 1925 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20 JUL 1999
Charitable objects
PROPOGATION OF CHRISTIAN TRUTH
Area of benefit
HADLEY HEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
197 High Street
BARNET
EN5 5SU
- Phone:
- 02084494833
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window