ACTION MEDICAL RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Action Medical Research is a charity whose objects are to promote medical research into the prevention, management and cure of disabling diseases and conditions. We are a UK-wide charity saving and changing children's lives through medical research. We fund a broad range of cutting-edge medical research most likely to deliver real benefit to babies, children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,986,085
Donations and legacies | £6.92m | |
Charitable activities | £929.70k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £135.13k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,974,454
Raising funds | £4.31m | |
Charitable activities | £3.66m | |
Other | £0 |
-£802,708 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £929,702 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.31m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.66m | |
Retained for future use | £11.63k |
People

49 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
550 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 August 1992: Standard registration
- ACTION FOR THE CRIPPLED CHILD (Previous name)
- ACTION RESEARCH (Previous name)
- ACTION RESEARCH FOR THE CRIPPLED CHILD (Previous name)
- ARCC (Previous name)
- NATIONAL FUND FOR POLIOMYELITIS RESEARCH (Previous name)
- NATIONAL FUND FOR RESEARCH INTO POLIOMYELITIS AND OTHER CRIPPLING DISEASES (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL FUND FOR RESEARCH INTO CRIPPLING DISEASES (KNOWN AS ACTION RESEARCH) (Previous name)
- THE POLIO RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke George Batchelor Bordewich | Chair | 05 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bhavin Patel | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
CLARE JOANNA ELIZABETH FERGUSON | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephanie Schorge | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann Last | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Jonathan Stoneham-Buck | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Henry Rowitch | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Lynn Harvey | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Duncan Wild | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Edwards | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61m | £3.60m | £4.45m | £6.11m | £7.99m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.23m | £4.69m | £5.34m | £7.22m | £7.97m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £151.70k | £4.29k | £467.78k | £929.70k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.50m | £3.40m | £4.33m | £5.54m | £6.92m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £467.78k | £929.70k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £114.80k | £43.64k | £123.15k | £103.93k | £135.13k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £151.70k | £4.29k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £407.76k | £300.24k | £276.88k | £195.11k | £486.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.35m | £2.59m | £2.78m | £3.65m | £3.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.89m | £2.11m | £2.56m | £3.58m | £4.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £101.99k | £18.54k | £0 | £0 | £25.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.25m | £1.56m | £1.76m | £2.55m | £2.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £116.88k | £118.76k | £134.08k | £134.54k | £119.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £310.55k | £294.51k | £302.27k | £282.52k | £60.01k | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.66m | £11.95m | £12.50m | £12.11m | £12.80m | |
|
Other assets | £1.38m | £1.52m | £1.19m | £1.68m | £2.56m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.30m | £7.12m | £7.18m | £7.53m | £7.53m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MAY 1955 AS AMENDED 8 DECEMBER 1959, 7 AUGUST 1990, 10 JULY 1996 AND 7 JULY 1999, AND 30 OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 17 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, CURE, MANAGEMENT AND ALLEVIATION OF DISABLING DISEASES AND CONDITIONS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH SHALL BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 21 August 1992 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Action Medical Research
5th Floor
167-169 Great Portland Street
London
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 01403210406
- Email:
- info@action.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window