UNITED KINGDOM TEA TRADE BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the living standards of ex employees (and/or their spouses) of UK companies who were engaged in the tea trade and based in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- TTBS (Working name)
- TEA TRADE OF LONDON BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Donald Herries Gibbs | Chair |
|
||||||
Richard David Smyth | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justin Peter Rippon | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Henry Jefferies | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Taylor | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Stradling Marsh | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Gray | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Henry Boocock | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
William Dixon | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Ernest Ferris - Lay | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PALMER | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|||||
ALAN STANLEY HOBBS | Trustee | 21 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TUDOR HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.43k | £10.08k | £12.55k | £17.38k | £17.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.56k | £8.65k | £13.27k | £17.45k | £17.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS.
Charitable objects
GRANTING ASSISTANCE OR ANNUITIES TO PERSONS IN INDIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES WHO ARE, OR WHO HAVE BEEN, CONNECTED WITH THE LONDON TEA TRADE, AND TO DEPANDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Paddington Close
HAYES
UB4 9QH
- Phone:
- 02088422576
- Email:
- ukttbs@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window