THE BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist financially persons, or their dependants, working, or previously having worked in the trades embraced by the British Allied Trades Federation who through infirmity, disablement, ill health or other disadvantage are in conditions of need. To support education and training by providing for bursaries or other financial support to those working or intending to work in the trades.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 12 May 2025: Funds received from 1013026 BIRMINGHAM ASSAY OFFICE CHARITABLE TRUST
- BRITISH JEWELLERY AND GIFTWARE FEDERATION BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (Previous name)
- BRITISH JEWELLERY GIFTWARE & FINISHING FEDERATION BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (Previous name)
- THE BRITISH JEWELLERY GIFTWARE AND LEATHERGOODS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jordan | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Meg Hawkins | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henrik Skouby | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gay Penfold | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gary Wroe | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARIE GERALDINE BRENNAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.34k | £72.90k | £82.60k | £149.38k | £92.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.46k | £99.50k | £177.29k | £124.56k | £168.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDED IN 1924 (SEE COPY OF RULES AND REGULATIONS AMENDED 6TH JUNE 1944, 2ND JUNE 1980 AND 11 JUNE 1996) AS AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 17TH JUNE 2004 CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST FINANCIALLY PERSONS, OR THEIR DEPENDANTS, WORKING OR PREVIOUSLY HAVING WORKED IN THE TRADES EMBRACED BY THE BRITISH ALLIED TRADES FEDERATION WHO IN OLD AGE OR THROUGH INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT OR ILL HEALTH ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED; TO SUPPORT EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY PROVIDING FOR BURSARIES OR OTHER FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FEDERATION HOUSE
10 VYSE STREET
HOCKLEY
BIRMINGHAM
B18 6LT
- Phone:
- 01212371138
- Email:
- laura.b.banner@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window