THE GUILD OF BENEVOLENCE OF THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Guild aims to assist generally in the relief of hardship for marine engineers, past and present members of the IMarEST, and their dependents, by making regular grants to supplement very low incomes and by making one-off grants to assist in the purchase of items essential for the recipient's wellbeing, essential home repairs, costs of respite care and with debt relief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Malaysia
- New Zealand
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 26 June 1969: Standard registration
- GUILD OF BENEVOLENCE OF THE IMAREST (Working name)
- THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERS GUILD OF BENEVOLENCE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor James Crabbe CMarSci | Chair | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Atkinson MNM BSc | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Captain Henry Bryan Anthony Richard Andrews BSc AFNI | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Goldsworthy CEng | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Campbell | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Gary John Hindmarch CEng | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sajid Hussain CEng | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Darby BA FCA | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eur Ing Elisabeth Diane Wilson CEng | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Keuning CEng | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eur Ing Peter Simon Rickaby CEng | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN MURPHY | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.04k | £132.23k | £128.00k | £108.80k | £229.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.62k | £125.95k | £129.99k | £146.72k | £144.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES MAY 1958 AS AMENDED 6TH OCTOBER 1964, 29TH APRIL 1969, 24TH APRIL 1973, 13TH APRIL 1977, 9TH MARCH 1989, 12 MARCH 1998, 7TH MARCH 2002 AND 13 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 MAR 2014 as amended on 11 Mar 2021 as amended on 12 Mar 2024 as amended on 12 Mar 2024 as amended on 12 Mar 2024 as amended on 12 Mar 2024 as amended on 12 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE GRANTING OF RELIEF TO NECESSITOUS AND DESERVING PERSONS WHO ARE (A) PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTE AND PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS, (B) MARINE ENGINEERS WHO POSSESS OR HAVE POSSESSED CERTIFICATES OF COMPETENCY OR CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE ISSUED BY THE RELEVANT UK GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENT OR AGENCY OR THEIR EQUIVALENT, (C) PAST AND PRESENT EMPLOYEES OF THE INSTITUTE OR OF THE GUILD AND (D) THE WIVES, HUSBANDS, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, CHILDREN AND/OR DEPENDANTS OF ANY OF THE PERSONS REFERRED TO IN THE PRECEDING PARAGRAPHS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 BIRDCAGE WALK
LONDON
SW1H 9JJ
- Phone:
- 02073822644
- Email:
- guild@imarest.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window