EVENTIDE HOMES TRUST

Charity number: 208761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Homes for twenty persons of good character and moral worth in reduced circumstances being married couples, single or widow women who are unable to maintain themselves wholly by their own efforts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,000
Total expenditure: £10,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 July 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RIVERSIDE GROUP LIMITED Trustee 31 March 2010
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £603 £650 £3.60k £4.00k £10.00k
Total expenditure £603 £650 £3.60k £4.00k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DEED OF ENDOWMENT DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1925. WILL PROVED AT BIRMINGHAM 23 JULY 1931. SCHEMES OF 29 JUNE 1967 AND 9 MAY 1989.
Charitable objects
INCOME FOR 1) REPAIRS, INSURANCE AND OTHER OUTGOINGS PAYABLE IN RESPECT OF HOMES. 2) YEARLY SUM TO SINKING FUND (AS IN CLAUSE 4 OF DEED OF ENDOWMENT) 3) PAYMENT OF SALARY TO INMATE ACTING AS CARETAKER SUPERINTENDENT AND MATRON. TRUSTEES MAY ALSO PAY CLERK AND/OR TREASURER SUCH SALARY OR SALARIES AS PRINCIPAL TRUSTEES THINK PROPER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 July 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE RIVERSIDE GROUP LTD
2 ESTUARY BOULEVARD
SPEKE
LIVERPOOL
L24 8RF
Phone:
0151 295 6034