Trustees CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 208767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenny Bentham Chair 17 October 2017
CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Tracy Pickett Trustee 31 March 2019
None on record
Clair Torres Trustee 20 October 2017
None on record
Joan Lockett Trustee 01 May 2012
CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Mick Fry Trustee 01 March 2000
None on record