Accounts and annual returns THE HOWIS TRUST

Charity number: 208786
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 27 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 27 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 05 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 05 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 21 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 21 December 2004 On Time