THE HOWIS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 1962: Standard registration
- 17 July 2007: Removed
- 17 July 2007: Funds transferred to 1101143-1 HOWIS TRUST
- ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF ANNE FRANCES HOWIS AND EMMA FRISBY HOWIS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.63k | £20.54k | £24.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.29k | £37.00k | £34.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 27 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 27 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 05 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 05 October 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 21 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 21 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 24 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 21 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES ("BENEFICIARIES" MEANS WOMEN IN NEED WHO ARE 50 YEARS OLD AND OVER); AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS ("RESIDENTS" MEANS THOSE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY WHO LIVE IN THE HOMES) AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window