Accounts and annual returns Westfield Friends Community Centre

Charity number: 208832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required