THE PRINTING CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have been supporting people who work or have worked in printing, packaging and publishing since 1827. Our charitable aims include promoting independence, protecting dignity and furthering skills. We meet our aims through providing financial, emotional and practical support, including a free 24/7 helpline, and working with industry partners to champion the sector's emerging talent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,159,781
Donations and legacies | £8.59k | |
Charitable activities | £492.67k | |
Other trading activities | £15.89k | |
Investments | £642.64k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,011,423
Raising funds | £206.76k | |
Charitable activities | £2.80m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,963,508 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £206.76k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.80m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £206.76k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.80m | |
Retained for future use | £111.87k |
People

18 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- PRINTERS' CHARITABLE CORPORATION (Previous name)
- PRINTERS' PENSION ALMSHOUSE AND ORPHAN ASYLUM CORPORATION (Previous name)
- THE PRINTING CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Phillips | Chair | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lance Ralph John Hill | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donald McCormick | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elenor Hamshire | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sayandhan Mathavan | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Cook | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Paul Bernstein | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neal | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Bull | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49m | £1.36m | £1.33m | £1.06m | £1.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83m | £2.62m | £3.12m | £3.39m | £3.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £34.06k | £7.55k | £141.33k | £14.37k | £8.59k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £19.97k | £273 | £500 | £13.92k | £15.89k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £533.30k | £500.14k | £467.48k | £502.93k | £492.67k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £904.64k | £847.88k | £716.58k | £532.15k | £642.64k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £34.06k | £7.55k | £141.24k | £0 | £319 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.47m | £2.31m | £2.95m | £3.14m | £2.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £204.73k | £174.18k | £166.29k | £255.30k | £206.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £87.74k | £88.44k | £80.82k | £128.93k | £111.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £1.13m | £96.67k | £102.48k | £105.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £184.81k | £160.83k | £165.49k | £230.93k | £178.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £154.34k | £137.67k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.20m | £5.34m | £6.11m | £6.13m | £5.81m | |
|
Long-term investments | £32.00m | £31.61m | £33.70m | £28.65m | £28.00m | |
|
Other assets | £4.21m | £4.90m | £3.25m | £1.70m | £2.66m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £386.69k | £353.29k | £523.28k | £348.76k | £223.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 03/01/1865 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 03/01/1952 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 23/10/1972 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/1865 AS AMENDED ON 03/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 18/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 29/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 14/07/2014
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF AGED OR POOR AND DISTRESSED PERSONS BEING PERSONS WHO ARE OR WERE EITHER PRINTERS OR OTHER PERSONS EMPLOYED OR FORMERLY EMPLOYED IN THE PRINTING TRADE OR ANY ALLIED TRADE. (B) THE RELIEF OF THE WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF ELIGIBLE PERSONS DECEASED, SUCH WIDOWS OR CHILDREN BEING THEMSELVES AGED OR IN DISTRESS AND IN NEED OF RELIEF. (C) THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN OF ELIGIBLE PERSONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SUPPLEMENTARY CHARTER OF 23RD OCTOBER 1972).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ASSOCIATION OF PRINTERS TRUSTS
- BENJAMIN FRANKLIN STEVENS
- BUTLIN CHARITABLE TRUST FOR THE PRINTING & ALLIED TRADES
- CAXTON CONVALESCENT HOME
- CHARLES EDWARD LAYTON PENSION FUND
- GEORGE BIGGS
- HENRY WILLIAM HUTCHINGS
- HERBERT HEATHER
- JANE WHITTINGHAM
- JOHN CLARKE BLOOMFIELD
- JOHN HOGG
- JOHN T LANE
- MARY ANN MASTERS
- MRS CHARLOTTE STEVENS
- MRS ELIZABETH MITCHENER
- MRS FRANCES ANN PARDOE
- ROBERT HARRILD
- ROSANNA FIGGINS
- ROWARTH'S ANNUITY
- THE ELIZABETH AND ROBERT TROTTER PENSION
- THE RIGHT HONOURABLE GEORGE ALLARDICE BARON RIDDELL
- THE SOPHIA TOMLYN PENSION
- THE THOMAS BUCK PENSION
- THE YATES AND COMPANY (WALTER AND CLARA D'LENY) PENSIONS
- WILLIAM COOPER VIRGO
- WILLIAM KELIHER
- 11 March 1996 : Standard registration
- 05 March 2010 : Removed
- 05 March 2010 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fourth Floor
The Pinnacle
Station Way
Crawley
RH10 1JH
- Phone:
- 01293649360
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window