Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HINCHINGBROOKE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 208894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 04 March 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 04 March 2025 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 19 April 2023 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 07 March 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required