THE CHARITY OF SIR JOHN PICTO AND OTHERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO MAINTAIN, ADMINISTER PROPERTY AND LAND IN THE OWNERSHIP OF THE CHARITY. THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BUXTON WITH LAMAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 01 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Constance Graver | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Valerie Joy Nichols | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ROTH | Trustee | 02 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Whitbread | Trustee | 02 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR MATTHEW RICHARD MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.12k | £44.41k | £45.34k | £50.96k | £55.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.73k | £10.37k | £35.96k | £18.18k | £20.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 9TH JULY 1969
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BUXTON WITH LAMMAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF ENN, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BUXTON WITH LAMMAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beam End
Mill Street
Buxton
NORWICH
NR10 5JE
- Phone:
- 01603 279823
- Email:
- stephenpipe@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window