Trustees HILGAY UNITED CHARITIES (NON-ECCLESIASTICAL BRANCH)
Charity Number: 208898

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN WILLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Nigel Paul Moat | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Kisby | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mesher | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Dent | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Barrington | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Evans | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE STARLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM ANTHONY CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM BRIAN CHARLESWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER BATES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.