Financial history ST. ALBANS AND REGION SCOPE

Charity Number: 208903
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £6.19k £1.47k £11.75k £2.07k £6.05k
Total expenditure £2.88k £3.50k £6.12k £836 £5.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A