Financial history THE HACKNEY HORSE SOCIETY

Charity number: 208905
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 29/09/2023
Total gross income £79.51k £42.57k £53.86k £75.70k £86.64k
Total expenditure £84.36k £69.53k £58.06k £81.84k £85.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A