SAXMUNDHAM WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 208932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide relief for Saxmundham residents who are in need,hardship or distress.Also pay for such items,services or facilities to alleviate suffering.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £330
Total expenditure: £150

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SAXMUNDHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LADY LUCILLE BATHO Chair
None on record
James Peter Charles Sandbach Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Jane Anderson Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Rev David Nathan Preece Trustee 07 June 2021
SKC Church
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SAMUEL CLOUTING
Received: On time
Jenny Mann Trustee 12 May 2016
None on record
Jackey Phillips Trustee 10 May 2016
None on record
David Willett Trustee 05 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £355 £355 £360 £380 £330
Total expenditure £430 £135 £760 £650 £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 19 DECEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF SAXMUNDHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF SAXMUNDHAM
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Cavendish House
The Spinney
SAXMUNDHAM
Suffolk
IP17 1AR
Phone:
01728602177
Website:

No information available