WEST HACKNEY PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to relieve poverty and for advancement in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
Governance
- WHPC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Justin Charles Gau | Chair | 13 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Councillor Frank Baffour | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Gilbert Smyth | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christian Adams | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
POLLY MANN | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Cardale | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Fieber | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|||||
KATHRYN JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN INNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EMMA PLOUVIEZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRFAN SIDDIK MALIK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.94k | £217.21k | £211.86k | £217.80k | £151.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.65k | £130.43k | £188.99k | £166.98k | £207.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 JUNE 2010. AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2017 as amended on 11 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25, RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 3. IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECTS SPECIFIED IN SUB CLAUSES 1 & 2 ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THEY SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST HACKNEY AND THE NEIGHBOURING PARISHES.
Linked charities
- ABRAHAM LOPEZ PEREIRA
- ANN SANDFORD
- ANN WOOD (WEST HACKNEY SHARE)
- ANTHONY ANDREE
- BISHOP DOULBEN AND GEORGE HUMBLE
- BISHOP WOOD FUND
- CHARLES DIGBY
- ELIZABETH BAGSHAWE
- HENRY BANNISTER
- HENRY FEILD
- HENRY ROWE
- JACOB FRANCO
- JEREMIAH MARLOW
- JOANNA HUSSEY
- JOHN FEILD
- JOHN HAMMOND
- MARGARET AUDLEY FUND
- MARIA POWELL
- NEHEMIAH ROBSON
- PAROCHIAL FUND
- REVEREND THOMAS JAMESON
- RICHARD CHENEY
- RICHARD SOUTH AND ESTHER WHITE
- ROBERT POOLE BARLOW
- SIR STEPHEN WHITE
- SIR THOMAS AND THOMAS VYNER
- ST JOHN HACKNEY JOINT ESTATES CHARITIES (WEST HACKNEY SHARE)
- THOMAS HERON
- THOMAS WYLES
- VALENTINE POOLE
- WILLIAM BROOKS
- WILLIAM SWAINE
- 08 October 1962 : Standard registration
- 19 July 2007 : Removed
- 19 July 2007 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
HACKNEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Unit 11
8-20 Well Street
LONDON
E9 7PX
- Phone:
- 01285841900
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window