CASTLE CARY PARISH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit public activities locally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 September 1962: Standard registration
- 09 September 2021: Funds received from 1003282 THE GIFFORD (RELIEF IN NEED) CHARITY
- JOHN ILES BARNES FOR ALMHOUSES (Previous name)
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Ball | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kellagher | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elisabeth Isted Dr | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Judi MORISON | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107 | £22.38k | £12.19k | £203 | £881 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10.31k | £630 | £8.79k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 26TH DECEMBER 1910, PROVED AT BLANDFORD 29TH JANUARY 1914. UN REP VOL. 217.PP359A. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 25 MAY 1995 AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS OR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATIONAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES OF SUCH PERSONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
THE UNITED ECLESTAISTICAL BENEFICES OF CASTLE GARY AND AWSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
Church Street
CASTLE CARY
Somerset
BA7 7EJ
- Phone:
- 01963 350934
- Email:
- vicarcaryansford@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window