Accounts and annual returns WAKEFIELD (TOWER HILL TRINITY SQUARE) TRUST

Charity Number: 209123
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 31 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 02 April 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 28 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 28 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 27 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 27 March 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 12 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 12 October 2005 On Time