WAKEFIELD (TOWER HILL TRINITY SQUARE) TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to charities and community groups working within the area of benefit. The charity gives priority to projects: - focusing on the needs of women, especially with regard to their effectiveness in the workplace, in wider society and within the family - working with the elderly to provide support, companionship and encouragement to live as full a life as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of London
- Southwark
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 25 July 1962: Standard registration
- 27 July 2009: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 27 July 2009: Funds transferred to 1121779 WAKEFIELD AND TETLEY TRUST
- THE WAKEFIELD TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £365.01k | £321.95k | £315.66k | £342.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.35k | £345.01k | £288.06k | £390.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 02 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 28 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 28 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 27 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 27 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 12 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 12 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 25 MAY 1937 AND 14 JULY 1938 AND SCHEME DATED 13 MARCH 1956
Charitable objects
WAKEFIELD HOUSES SHALL BE HELD UPON SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND USED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS WILL BE MOST CONDUCIVE TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF TOWER HILL AND TRINITY SQUARE AS A CENTRE FROM WHICH WELFARE WORK CAN BE PROMOTED
Area of benefit
ONE MILE RADIUS OF 41 TRINITY SQUARE, LONDON EC3
Linked charities
- 25 July 1962 : Standard registration
- 27 July 2009 : Removed
- 27 July 2009 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window