Financial history THE JOHN LEWIS PARTNERSHIP GENERAL COMMUNITY FUND

Charity number: 209128
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2015 30/01/2016 30/01/2017 31/01/2018 26/01/2019
Total gross income £550.98k £646.08k £766.04k £693.32k £213.95k
Total expenditure £550.98k £646.08k £766.04k £693.32k £213.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £550.98k £646.08k £766.04k £689.92k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.40k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £550.98k £646.08k £766.04k £693.32k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £689.92k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A